|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 09/04/1931 | 16/04/1931 | 8 days | Light Repair | Experimental fog S.A. fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1932 | 06/05/1932 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1932 | 27/09/1932 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/07/1933 | 28/08/1933 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1934 | 13/07/1934 | 40 days | General | Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1936 | 13/06/1936 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1905 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1936 | 1 day | W | ||||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1937 | 03/09/1937 | 66 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1938 | 30/09/1938 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1940 | 24/07/1940 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27479 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/07/1942 | 04/09/1942 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2306 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1943 | 02/03/1943 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/11/1944 | 23/12/1944 | 38 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1947 | 16/08/1947 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/05/1949 | 04/06/1949 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64818 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/03/1951 | 14/04/1951 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/09/1952 | 24/10/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27472 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/04/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/12/1956 | 29/12/1956 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/01/1958 | 08/03/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/04/1960 | 04/06/1960 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/10/1960 | 03/11/1960 | 22 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. | SLS/194710 |
05/06/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. | SLS/194907 |
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/01/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1489 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1490 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
09/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1931. Dep: 16/04/1931. Work undertaken: Experimental fog S.A. fitted |
||
29/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1932. Dep: 06/05/1932. | ||
05/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1932. Dep: 27/09/1932. | ||
24/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1933. Dep: 28/08/1933. | ||
04/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1934. Dep: 13/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1905 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/09/1936 | Works Visit | |||
30/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/06/1937. Dep: 03/09/1937. | ||
26/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1938. Dep: 30/09/1938. | ||
25/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1940. Dep: 24/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27479 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1942. Dep: 04/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2306 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/02/1943. Dep: 02/03/1943. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
14/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
16/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. | ||
12/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4818 | ||
24/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 16/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/05/1949. Dep: 04/06/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64818 |
||
17/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/03/1951. Dep: 14/04/1951. | ||
17/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1952. Dep: 24/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27472 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/04/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. | ||
13/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/12/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956. | ||
31/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1958. Dep: 08/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
22/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
22/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/04/1960. Dep: 04/06/1960. | ||
13/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1960. Dep: 03/11/1960. | ||
24/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64818 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
11/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |