|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 18/05/1932 | 10/06/1932 | 24 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/06/1932 | 01/07/1932 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/09/1933 | 23/09/1933 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/11/1933 | 02/12/1933 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/10/1934 | 29/11/1934 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/01/1936 | 26/02/1936 | 37 days | Heavy | Boiler number C1717 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/11/1937 | 20/12/1937 | 28 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/12/1937 | 04/01/1938 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/01/1940 | 29/02/1940 | 30 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/10/1941 | 12/12/1941 | 45 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/07/1943 | 03/09/1943 | 53 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1945 | 1 day | W | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 01/02/1946 | 23/03/1946 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27469 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4821 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/04/1948 | 03/07/1948 | 66 days | General | Boiler number BP131 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64821 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/06/1950 | 12/07/1950 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/09/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 27473 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/02/1953 | 12/03/1953 | 30 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/12/1955 | 21/01/1956 | 38 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/02/1958 | 12/04/1958 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27480 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1961 | 05/05/1961 | 16 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
30/06/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. | SLS/195008 |
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Awaiting Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/02/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2787 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1493 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
27/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
18/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1932. Dep: 10/06/1932. | ||
12/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/06/1932. Dep: 01/07/1932. | ||
16/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/09/1933. Dep: 23/09/1933. | ||
24/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1933. Dep: 02/12/1933. | ||
25/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1934. Dep: 29/11/1934. | ||
21/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/01/1936. Dep: 26/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1717 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1937. Dep: 20/12/1937. | ||
28/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/12/1937. Dep: 04/01/1938. | ||
31/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1940. Dep: 29/02/1940. | ||
29/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1941. Dep: 12/12/1941. | ||
13/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1943. Dep: 03/09/1943. | ||
23/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
15/05/1945 | Works Visit | |||
01/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27469 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4821 |
||
29/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1948. Dep: 03/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP131 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64821 |
||
15/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
21/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
13/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/06/1950. Dep: 12/07/1950. | ||
26/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27473 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1953. Dep: 12/03/1953. | ||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) | ||
15/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/12/1955. Dep: 21/01/1956. | ||
20/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1958. Dep: 12/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27480 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
20/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1961. Dep: 05/05/1961. | ||
16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64821 from Thornaby (51L) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |