Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 233 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4401 Week
» 19515 Month
» 322705 Year
» 1544270 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2963 on 16/09/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4824   27/10/1946
British Railways 64824   05/06/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Tue 16/09/1931 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Tue 29/03/1960 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping During 04/1960
Service Life 28 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton - Boiler retained and used on 64918

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) on 16/09/1931
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 15/09/1936
GOR Gorton on 04/02/1938
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 24/02/1939
GOR Gorton on 13/04/1947
39B Sheffield Darnall on 08/04/1951
39A Gorton on 27/10/1957
   Withdrawn on 29/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton on 13/04/1947
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 02/11/1957
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 02/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/09/1931 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8581)
23/06/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8775)
06/07/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8587)
18/02/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2769)
16/02/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8773)
21/10/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2312)
18/04/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27753)
22/10/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27796)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/06/1934 23/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 8775 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 13/05/1936 06/07/1936 55 days General
Boiler number 8587 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 30/07/1936 14/09/1936 47 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 03/03/1938 07/03/1938 5 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 20/01/1939 18/02/1939 30 days General
Boiler number 2769 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 28/09/1941 05/01/1942 100 days General  
Gorton Works 14/03/1943 27/07/1943 136 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 05/12/1943 08/01/1944 35 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 03/12/1944 16/02/1945 76 days General
Boiler number 8773 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1945 10/04/1945 34 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 08/08/1946 14/12/1946 129 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4824
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1947 21/10/1947 122 days General
Boiler number 2312 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1947 16/11/1947 7 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 29/03/1951 05/06/1951 69 days Heavy Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 64824
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1953 18/04/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 27753 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1955 22/10/1955 36 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 27796 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/09/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2963
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
09/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8775 (Diagram 97)
   
13/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1936. Dep: 06/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8587 (Diagram 97)
   
30/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/07/1936. Dep: 14/09/1936.    
15/09/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
04/02/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1938. Dep: 07/03/1938.    
20/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1939. Dep: 18/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2769 (Diagram 97)
   
24/02/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
28/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1941. Dep: 05/01/1942.    
14/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/03/1943. Dep: 27/07/1943.    
05/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/12/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944.    
03/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1944. Dep: 16/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8773 (Diagram 97)
   
08/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1945. Dep: 10/04/1945.    
08/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4824
   
13/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1947. Dep: 21/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2312 (Diagram 97)
   
10/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1947. Dep: 16/11/1947.    
29/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/03/1951. Dep: 05/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64824
   
08/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
28/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27753 (Diagram 97)
   
17/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
Boiler number 27796 (Diagram 97)
   
27/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
29/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64824 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev