|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/06/1934 | 23/06/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 8775 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1936 | 06/07/1936 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 8587 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1936 | 14/09/1936 | 47 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1938 | 07/03/1938 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1939 | 18/02/1939 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2769 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1941 | 05/01/1942 | 100 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1943 | 27/07/1943 | 136 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1943 | 08/01/1944 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1944 | 16/02/1945 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 8773 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1945 | 10/04/1945 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1946 | 14/12/1946 | 129 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4824 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1947 | 21/10/1947 | 122 days | General | Boiler number 2312 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1947 | 16/11/1947 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 29/03/1951 | 05/06/1951 | 69 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64824 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 27753 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1955 | 22/10/1955 | 36 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27796 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/09/1931 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2963 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1532 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
09/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8775 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1936. Dep: 06/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8587 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/07/1936. Dep: 14/09/1936. | ||
15/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
04/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
03/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1938. Dep: 07/03/1938. | ||
20/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1939. Dep: 18/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2769 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/02/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
28/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1941. Dep: 05/01/1942. | ||
14/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/03/1943. Dep: 27/07/1943. | ||
05/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/12/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944. | ||
03/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1944. Dep: 16/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8773 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1945. Dep: 10/04/1945. | ||
08/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4824 |
||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1947. Dep: 21/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2312 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1947. Dep: 16/11/1947. | ||
29/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/03/1951. Dep: 05/06/1951. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64824 |
||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
28/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27753 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27796 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
29/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64824 from Gorton (9G) | ||
04/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |