|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/11/1934 | 15/12/1934 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 823 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1937 | 24/04/1937 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/02/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 108 days | General | Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1942 | 28/11/1942 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27714 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1944 | 09/02/1945 | 61 days | General | Boiler number E1352 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1947 | 18/12/1947 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1949 | 09/04/1949 | 63 days | Heavy Casual | Renumbered to BR 64825 |
||
Derby Works | 17/08/1951 | 09/10/1951 | 54 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1954 | 24/04/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27831 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1957 | 28/12/1957 | 29 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27764 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/09/1931 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2964 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1533 Allocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
26/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 823 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
31/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1942. Dep: 28/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27714 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1944. Dep: 09/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1352 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4825 | ||
07/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1947. Dep: 18/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1949. Dep: 09/04/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64825 |
||
17/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/08/1951. Dep: 09/10/1951. | ||
25/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1954. Dep: 24/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27831 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1957. Dep: 28/12/1957. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27764 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
11/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
02/11/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64825 from Sunderland (52G) |