Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 313 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2878 Week
» 1616 Month
» 415937 Year
» 1637502 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2964 on 29/09/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4825   25/11/1946
British Railways 64825   09/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Thu 29/09/1931 to Parkeston Quay (PKS)
Withdrawal Thu 02/11/1961 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 11/1961
Service Life 30 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PKS Parkeston Quay (New) on 29/09/1931
ARD Ardsley on 07/02/1936
52G Sunderland on 13/12/1959
   Withdrawn on 02/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 31/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/09/1931 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8582)
15/12/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 823)
24/04/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8591)
15/06/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2182)
28/11/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3201)
09/02/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1352)
18/12/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3211)
24/04/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27831)
28/12/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27764)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/11/1934 15/12/1934 20 days General
Boiler number 823 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1937 24/04/1937 25 days General
Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 29/02/1940 15/06/1940 108 days General
Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1942 28/11/1942 54 days General
Boiler number 27714 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1944 09/02/1945 61 days General
Boiler number E1352 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1947 18/12/1947 73 days General
Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1949 09/04/1949 63 days Heavy Casual
Renumbered to BR 64825
 
Derby Works 17/08/1951 09/10/1951 54 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 25/03/1954 24/04/1954 31 days General
Boiler number 27831 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1957 28/12/1957 29 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 27764 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/04/1946 Midland Section 4825 has been fitted with a self-cleaning smoke-box (15/4). 2683 (26A) was noted at Wellingborough, running light, on 20/3. An interesting working for which Bedford shed is responsible is a trip to Gloucester. The route is via Northampton and Stratford, and the locomotive, usually a 3F, is due out at 3 a.m, and does not re-turn until late at night. SLS/194605
24/11/1945 Willesden No. 28786, one of the last survivors of the L.N.W. 19in. goods worked a goods train from Willesden on 24/11/45. This is the first known appearance of one of these engines in London for many years. SLS/194605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/09/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2964
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
07/02/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
25/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4825    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
02/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64825 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev