Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 762 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3448 Week
» 4338 Month
» 312319 Year
» 1196700 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2966   09/12/1931
LNER (1946) 4827   15/12/1946
BR 64827   18/07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 09/12/1931 to Lincoln (LIN)
Withdrawal Mon 01/02/1960 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 28 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIN Lincoln (New) 09/12/1931
IMM Immingham 17/06/1945
LIN Lincoln 09/12/1945
IMM Immingham 22/12/1946
CLK Colwick 27/04/1947
36A Doncaster 01/03/1959
   Withdrawn 01/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 28/12/1946
ALLOC CLK Colwick 27/04/1947
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   01/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/12/1931 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8584)
09/02/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8585)
23/05/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8006)
27/08/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2095)
28/12/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
08/12/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2681)
03/01/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2316)
18/07/1950 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2672)
28/03/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27750)
28/05/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27838)
16/11/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27794)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 11/12/1931 18/12/1931 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/12/1931 31/12/1931 13 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 19/01/1934 09/02/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1936 23/05/1936 20 days General
Boiler number 8006 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1938 27/08/1938 34 days General
Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1940 28/12/1940 340 days General
Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 05/08/1943 06/10/1943 63 days General  
Gorton Works 02/04/1944 29/04/1944 28 days General  
Gorton Works 09/09/1945 08/12/1945 91 days General
Boiler number 2681 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1947 03/01/1948 73 days General
Boiler number 2316 (Diagram 97)
 
Derby Works 17/05/1950 18/07/1950 63 days General
Boiler number 2672 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64827
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1953 28/03/1953 81 days General
Boiler number 27750 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1955 28/05/1955 41 days General
Boiler number 27838 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1955 05/11/1955 41 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 06/10/1957 16/11/1957 42 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 27794 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/12/1931 To Service To service as LNER Number 2966
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Lincoln (LIN)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
11/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1931. Dep: 18/12/1931.    
19/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931.    
19/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1934. Dep: 09/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97)
   
04/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8006 (Diagram 97)
   
25/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1938. Dep: 27/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97)
   
24/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 97)
   
05/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1943. Dep: 06/10/1943.    
02/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944.    
17/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2681 (Diagram 97)
   
09/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
15/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4827    
22/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1947. Dep: 03/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2316 (Diagram 97)
   
17/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1950. Dep: 18/07/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2672 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64827
   
07/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27750 (Diagram 97)
   
18/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27838 (Diagram 97)
   
26/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955.    
06/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
Boiler number 27794 (Diagram 97)
   
01/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
01/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64827 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev