|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/04/1934 | 05/05/1934 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 8593 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1936 | 27/08/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8582 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1939 | 18/02/1939 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 8020 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1941 | 31/05/1941 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 2770 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 15/07/1942 | 30/09/1942 | 78 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 2299 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1947 | 25/05/1947 | -95 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1949 | 14/01/1950 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64830 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1950 | 18/01/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 01/11/1951 | 09/01/1952 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 27687 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 24/05/1954 | 30/06/1954 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27887 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1956 | 15/11/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27789 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1956 | 20/11/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1957 | 02/03/1957 | 53 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1957 | 07/03/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/12/1931 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2969 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1538 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
13/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8593 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/08/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
15/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
06/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1936. Dep: 27/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8582 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1939. Dep: 18/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8020 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2770 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
04/01/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
15/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/07/1942. Dep: 30/09/1942. | ||
04/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
27/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2299 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
28/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
16/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4830 | ||
25/05/1947 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 2669 boiler fitted | ||
25/05/1947 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 27709 boiler fitted | ||
29/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1947. Dep: 25/05/1947. | ||
09/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 14/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64830 |
||
17/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1950. Dep: 18/01/1950. | ||
01/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1951. Dep: 09/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27687 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1954. Dep: 30/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27887 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1956. Dep: 15/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27789 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1956. Dep: 20/11/1956. | ||
09/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1957. Dep: 02/03/1957. | ||
05/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1957. Dep: 07/03/1957. | ||
08/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64830 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
28/02/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |