Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 579 Today
» 1207 Yesterday
» 579 Week
» 20224 Month
» 54866 Year
» 1276431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2977   27/05/1932
LNER (1946) 4838   17/11/1946
BR 64838   03/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Tue 27/05/1932 to Eastfield (EFD)
Withdrawal Tue 26/01/1960 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping Sun 28/02/1960
Service Life 27 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield (New) 27/05/1932
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 13/04/1943
CAR Carlisle Canal 12/12/1943
IPS Ipswich 24/03/1947
NOR Norwich Thorpe 20/04/1947
38E Woodford Halse 16/04/1950
38A Colwick 08/10/1950
40D Tuxford 27/09/1953
30A Stratford 16/01/1955
36A Doncaster 20/03/1955
   Withdrawn 26/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IPS Ipswich 24/03/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 20/04/1947
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse w/e 16/04/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 26/03/1955
WDN   26/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
27/05/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1796)
28/08/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1716)
03/11/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1834)
30/11/1946 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2116)
03/12/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4903)
19/06/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27668)
19/12/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27879)
11/08/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27744)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Cowlairs Works 03/06/1932 10/06/1932 8 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 27/07/1934 24/08/1934 29 days General  
Cowlairs Works 30/07/1936 28/08/1936 30 days General
Boiler number C1716 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 15/03/1937 17/03/1937 3 days Unclassified
Tender only
 
Cowlairs Works 25/01/1938 16/03/1938 51 days General  
Cowlairs Works 19/03/1940 11/04/1940 24 days General  
Cowlairs Works 16/08/1940 17/08/1940 2 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 03/10/1941 03/11/1941 32 days General
Boiler number 27532 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 02/06/1942 04/06/1942 3 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 07/05/1943 29/05/1943 23 days General  
Cowlairs Works 26/10/1944 31/10/1944 6 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 07/10/1946 30/11/1946 55 days General
W.P.U. off 5/47
Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4838
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1949 03/12/1949 52 days General
Boiler number 4903 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64838
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1949 09/12/1949 2 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 28/04/1951 19/06/1951 53 days General
Boiler number 27668 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 15/11/1953 19/12/1953 35 days General
Boiler number 27879 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1956 11/08/1956 67 days General
Boiler number 27744 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/05/1932 To Service To service as LNER Number 2977
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Eastfield (EFD)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
03/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1932. Dep: 10/06/1932.    
27/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1934. Dep: 24/08/1934.    
30/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1936. Dep: 28/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1716 (Diagram 97)
   
15/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1937. Dep: 17/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
25/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1938. Dep: 16/03/1938.    
19/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1940. Dep: 11/04/1940.    
16/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/08/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940.    
03/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1941. Dep: 03/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27532 (Diagram 97)
   
02/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1942. Dep: 04/06/1942.    
13/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
07/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943.    
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
26/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1944. Dep: 31/10/1944.    
07/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
W.P.U. off 5/47
Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4838
   
24/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
20/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
13/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4903 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64838
   
08/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1949. Dep: 09/12/1949.    
16/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
28/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1951. Dep: 19/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27668 (Diagram 97)
   
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
15/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27879 (Diagram 97)
   
16/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
06/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27744 (Diagram 97)
   
26/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64838 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev