Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 786 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2901 Week
» 25407 Month
» 328597 Year
» 1550162 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2979 on 15/06/1932
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4840   25/08/1946
British Railways 64840   04/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Tue 15/06/1932 to Eastfield (EFD)
Withdrawal Tue 27/11/1962 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping During 03/1963
Service Life 30 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield (New) on 15/06/1932
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 17/04/1943
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge on 12/12/1943
CAR Carlisle Canal on 15/06/1946
STR Stratford on 24/09/1947
ARD Ardsley on 18/09/1949
   Withdrawn on 27/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford on 24/09/1947
ALLOC ARD Ardsley w/e 24/09/1949
WDN   on 27/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/06/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1798)
20/11/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1796)
29/10/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1798)
19/07/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2277)
20/04/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27803)
20/02/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27531)
13/04/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27671)
04/06/1960 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27698)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Cowlairs Works 22/06/1932 24/06/1932 3 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 05/07/1934 15/07/1934 11 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 28/08/1934 15/10/1934 49 days General  
Cowlairs Works 13/10/1936 20/11/1936 39 days General
Boiler number 27481 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 25/05/1938 11/07/1938 48 days General  
Cowlairs Works 18/05/1939 19/05/1939 2 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 19/03/1940 13/04/1940 26 days General  
Cowlairs Works 29/09/1942 29/10/1942 31 days General
Boiler number C1798 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 07/08/1944 29/08/1944 23 days General  
Cowlairs Works 30/06/1945 19/07/1945 20 days General
Boiler number 2277 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 21/11/1945 07/12/1945 17 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 24/01/1947 25/01/1947 2 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 14/08/1947 11/09/1947 29 days General  
Gorton Works 19/01/1949 04/02/1949 17 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 64840
 
Derby Works 18/02/1951 20/04/1951 62 days General
Boiler number 27803 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1952 21/02/1953 72 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 24/02/1953 28/02/1953 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/01/1954 20/02/1954 51 days General
Boiler number 27531 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1954 02/03/1954 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 30/08/1955 16/09/1955 18 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 12/03/1957 13/04/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 27671 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1960 04/06/1960 54 days GI
Boiler number 27698 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/08/1947 Cowlairs Works On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. SLS/194710
07/09/1947 Eastfield MPD Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. SLS/194711
28/02/1951 Derby Works During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned.
At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic.
SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/06/1932 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2979
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Eastfield (EFD)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
22/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1932. Dep: 24/06/1932.    
05/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/07/1934. Dep: 15/07/1934.    
28/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1934. Dep: 15/10/1934.    
13/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1936. Dep: 20/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27481 (Diagram 97)
   
25/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1938. Dep: 11/07/1938.    
18/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1939. Dep: 19/05/1939.    
19/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940.    
29/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1942. Dep: 29/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1798 (Diagram 97)
   
17/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
07/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1944. Dep: 29/08/1944.    
30/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1945. Dep: 19/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2277 (Diagram 97)
   
21/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/11/1945. Dep: 07/12/1945.    
15/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4840    
24/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/01/1947. Dep: 25/01/1947.    
14/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1947. Dep: 11/09/1947.    
24/09/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
19/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1949. Dep: 04/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64840
   
18/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
18/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1951. Dep: 20/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27803 (Diagram 97)
   
12/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1952. Dep: 21/02/1953.    
24/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953.    
01/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1954. Dep: 20/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27531 (Diagram 97)
   
23/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 02/03/1954.    
30/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1955. Dep: 16/09/1955.    
12/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27671 (Diagram 97)
   
12/04/1960 Works Visit      
27/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64840 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev