|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 14/03/1934 | 10/04/1934 | 28 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1935 | 23/10/1935 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1937 | 06/08/1937 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1938 | 06/09/1938 | 9 days | Unclassified | Tender change |
||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1939 | 03/05/1939 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1939 | 03/06/1939 | 31 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1940 | 15/11/1940 | 9 days | Unclassified | Tender only |
||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1941 | 09/04/1941 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2601 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/01/1944 | 04/03/1944 | 39 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/09/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/07/1946 | 07/09/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27533 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/02/1947 | 22/02/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/09/1948 | 30/10/1948 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64844 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/03/1952 | 18/04/1952 | 37 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/12/1953 | 15/01/1954 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2597 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/05/1957 | 22/06/1957 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/10/1959 | 05/12/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 25835 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/12/1945 | Doncaster Works | Engines on works recently include 2000. On 29/12, during three hours observation at Doncaster, 15 V2's were observed, including 4826. The latter had been damaged at the front in a collision between an up Leeds express and a freight train at Lofthouse. It was coupled to 598, also dead, the locos being hauled by 4242. A three-coach local left in the up direction behind J39 1471 (BLA). | SLS/194604 |
14/04/1963 | Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) | 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/03/1904 | Modification | Diagram 97 number C1713 boiler fitted | ||
13/10/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1471 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1561 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1934. Dep: 10/04/1934. | ||
23/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1935. Dep: 23/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1937. Dep: 06/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/08/1938. Dep: 06/09/1938. Work undertaken: Tender change |
||
15/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1939. Dep: 03/05/1939. | ||
04/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1939. Dep: 03/06/1939. | ||
07/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1940. Dep: 15/11/1940. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
26/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1941. Dep: 09/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2601 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
26/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944. | ||
29/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. | ||
27/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27533 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4844 | ||
15/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1947. Dep: 22/02/1947. | ||
23/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1948. Dep: 30/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64844 |
||
14/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
13/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/03/1952. Dep: 18/04/1952. | ||
08/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1953. Dep: 15/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2597 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/05/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957. | ||
28/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1959. Dep: 05/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25835 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64844 from Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |