|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 09/04/1934 | 04/05/1934 | 26 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1934 | 12/05/1934 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1936 | 05/03/1936 | 35 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1936 | 1 day | W | ||||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1937 | 16/07/1937 | 3 days | Unclassified | Tender change |
||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1937 | 07/01/1938 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 1904 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1939 | 17/01/1940 | 34 days | General | Boiler number RS119 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1942 | 30/07/1942 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 1904 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/05/1944 | 03/06/1944 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/04/1945 | 28/04/1945 | 22 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/03/1947 | 31/05/1947 | 64 days | General | Boiler number C1715 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/05/1948 | 22/05/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64845 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/09/1949 | 29/10/1949 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/01/1952 | 02/02/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27516 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1954 | 21/08/1954 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/08/1957 | 19/09/1957 | 28 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/04/1960 | 15/04/1960 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/08/1960 | 26/08/1960 | 19 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1480 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1563 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted |
||
09/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1934. Dep: 04/05/1934. | ||
09/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1934. Dep: 12/05/1934. | ||
31/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1936. Dep: 05/03/1936. | ||
10/07/1936 | Works Visit | |||
14/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1937. Dep: 16/07/1937. Work undertaken: Tender change |
||
22/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1937. Dep: 07/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1904 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1939. Dep: 17/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS119 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1942. Dep: 30/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1904 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
15/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/05/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944. | ||
07/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4845 | ||
29/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1715 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/05/1948. Dep: 22/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64845 |
||
30/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/09/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949. | ||
04/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27516 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1954. Dep: 21/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1957. Dep: 19/09/1957. | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
04/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1960. Dep: 15/04/1960. | ||
08/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1960. Dep: 26/08/1960. | ||
21/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64845 from Thornaby (51L) | ||
09/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |