Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 263 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2828 Week
» 1566 Month
» 415887 Year
» 1637452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1483 on 19/05/1933
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4847   05/01/1947
British Railways 64847   04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 19/05/1933 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Fri 16/11/1962 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 29 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) on 19/05/1933
DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943
MID Middlesbrough on 25/07/1948
50D Starbeck on 27/09/1953
50C Selby on 14/06/1959
50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
52G Sunderland on 08/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 16/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MID Middlesbrough w/e 31/07/1948
WDN ARD Ardsley on 27/09/1949
ALLOC 50D Starbeck 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 50C Selby 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 16/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/11/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2340)
15/01/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2713)
20/01/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1738)
20/12/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2708)
02/05/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27528)
20/12/1958 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27454)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 18/02/1935 22/03/1935 33 days General  
Darlington Works 06/10/1936 26/11/1936 52 days General
Boiler number 2340 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 26/11/1936 16/12/1936 21 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 26/05/1939 01/07/1939 37 days General  
Darlington Works 06/12/1939 15/02/1940 72 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 12/08/1941 25/08/1941 14 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 08/12/1941 15/01/1942 39 days General
Boiler number 2713 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 06/11/1943 27/11/1943 22 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 13/12/1944 20/01/1945 39 days General
Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 25/03/1945 27/03/1945 3 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 04/05/1946 25/05/1946 22 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 06/10/1947 20/12/1947 76 days General
Boiler number 2708 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 06/08/1948 04/09/1948 30 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 64847
 
Cowlairs Works 09/08/1950 02/09/1950 25 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 13/11/1950 17/11/1950 5 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 11/03/1953 02/05/1953 53 days General
Boiler number 27528 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 12/01/1956 18/02/1956 38 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 28/11/1958 20/12/1958 23 days General
Boiler number 27454 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 27/07/1961 26/08/1961 31 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 31/08/1961 09/09/1961 10 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/09/1959 Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. SLS/195911
30/08/1961 Cowlairs Works (Weigh House) Erecting Shop: D2708/70/4, 44783, 45213, 45361, 61324/46/96, 65919, 80030, 90017, 90386, 90463, 90614. Valve Shop: 73077. Stripping Shop: 65923. Weigh House: 64847. Paint Shop: 73099. Works Yard: D2434, D2726, D3393, 44485, 61178, 64932, 72009, 73005, 80045, 90753. Scrap Yard: 64710 intact, 64700 being out-up. Works Shunters: D2760, D3418. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/05/1933 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1483
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
05/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 4847    
25/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (50D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
13/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
08/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
16/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64847 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev