|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 1 day | l/53 | |||||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1934 | 14/04/1934 | 4 days | Unclassified | Water scoop fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1935 | 27/11/1935 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1937 | 01/10/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number RS119 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1939 | 13/10/1939 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 1919 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1941 | 22/11/1941 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 27485 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/05/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 30 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/05/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4848 |
||
Gateshead Works | 09/12/1947 | 08/01/1948 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/09/1948 | 23/10/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64848 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/06/1951 | 07/07/1951 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/10/1953 | 31/10/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27524 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/02/1954 | 20/02/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/08/1956 | 22/09/1956 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 01/01/1957 | 11/02/1957 | 42 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/01/1960 | 03/12/1960 | 336 days | General | Boiler number 27428 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1961 | 1 day | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 04/01/1962 | 09/02/1962 | 37 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Awaiting Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
0000 | Works Visit | |||
15/03/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1412 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1577 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
11/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934. Work undertaken: Water scoop fitted |
||
18/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1935. Dep: 27/11/1935. | ||
20/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1937. Dep: 01/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS119 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1939. Dep: 13/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1919 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1941. Dep: 22/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27485 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
08/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
26/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. | ||
14/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4848 |
||
09/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1947. Dep: 08/01/1948. | ||
04/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
10/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
23/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1948. Dep: 23/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64848 |
||
13/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/06/1951. Dep: 07/07/1951. | ||
02/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27524 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1954. Dep: 20/02/1954. | ||
29/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
06/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
03/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
23/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956. | ||
01/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/01/1957. Dep: 11/02/1957. | ||
03/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1960. Dep: 03/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27428 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/10/1961. | ||
04/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/01/1962. Dep: 09/02/1962. | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64848 from West Auckland (51F) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |