|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 05/04/1934 | 09/04/1934 | 5 days | Unclassified | Water scoop fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1936 | 08/02/1936 | 27 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1937 | 09/02/1938 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1938 | 16/02/1938 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1939 | 23/12/1939 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2100 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1939 | 12/01/1940 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1941 | 22/01/1942 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/04/1944 | 27/05/1944 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/02/1945 | 17/03/1945 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/10/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 27486 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4851 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/02/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 127 days | General | Boiler number 2699 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64851 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/07/1951 | 25/08/1951 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/06/1954 | 10/07/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27533 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/10/1960 | 19/11/1960 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27651 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/12/1960 | 10/12/1960 | 5 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/01/1955 | North eastern Miscellany | Class D20 62372, looking clean and polished, has been working on local passenger turns between Sunderland and Newcastle during March. On Sunday, 20th March, trains between Sunderland and West Hartlepool were diverted via Wellfield, due to work on track maintenance on the main line, and the 5.0 p.m. train from Newcastle to Liverpool hauled by V2 60964 was piloted from Sunderland by G5 67328 to give assistance up Seaton bank which is 1 in 42 for about half a mile at its steepest. On Sunday, 26th March, class 5 45316 was noted descending Seaton bank with an excursion from the Midland Region. Locomotives used for football excursions to Sunderland on 30/3 included Nos. 76046. 61018 an 64851. |
SLS/195505 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/03/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1468 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1580 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
05/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1934. Dep: 09/04/1934. Work undertaken: Water scoop fitted |
||
13/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1936. Dep: 08/02/1936. | ||
09/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1937. Dep: 09/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1938. Dep: 16/02/1938. | ||
05/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
16/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1939. Dep: 23/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2100 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/12/1939. Dep: 12/01/1940. | ||
16/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
17/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1941. Dep: 22/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
24/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945. | ||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
19/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27486 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4851 |
||
02/01/1949 | Allocation | |||
19/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2699 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64851 |
||
27/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/07/1951. Dep: 25/08/1951. | ||
04/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
10/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27533 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
20/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1960. Dep: 19/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27651 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1960. Dep: 10/12/1960. | ||
26/02/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
20/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64851 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |