|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 20/04/1934 | 23/04/1934 | 4 days | Unclassified | Water scoop fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1935 | 03/01/1936 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1938 | 28/03/1938 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1940 | 29/06/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8580 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1942 | 05/09/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2277 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/05/1945 | 02/06/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2715 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/09/1947 | 25/10/1947 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 2940 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/09/1949 | 08/10/1949 | 36 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64852 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/06/1952 | 05/07/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27514 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/12/1954 | 22/12/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/11/1956 | 08/12/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27628 (Diagram 97) |
||
Inverurie Works | 07/05/1960 | 21/07/1960 | 76 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/03/1961 | 18/03/1961 | 3 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/09/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. | SLS/194711 |
30/10/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. | SLS/194712 |
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/03/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1472 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1581 Allocated to Middlesbrough (MID) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
20/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1934. Dep: 23/04/1934. Work undertaken: Water scoop fitted |
||
28/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1935. Dep: 03/01/1936. | ||
12/10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
14/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1938. Dep: 28/03/1938. | ||
01/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8580 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2277 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
05/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2715 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4852 | ||
03/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2940 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 03/09/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64852 |
||
04/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
10/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
05/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1952. Dep: 05/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27514 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1954. Dep: 22/12/1954. | ||
08/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1956. Dep: 08/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27628 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/05/1960. Dep: 21/07/1960. | ||
16/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/03/1961. Dep: 18/03/1961. | ||
05/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64852 from Heaton (52B) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |