|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 26/08/1936 | 08/10/1936 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1939 | 06/04/1939 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1939 | 20/04/1939 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1941 | 22/05/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number RS122 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1942 | 11/11/1942 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/01/1944 | 05/02/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2714 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/05/1945 | 02/06/1945 | 22 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 01/11/1946 | 26/11/1946 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/10/1947 | 10/01/1948 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 4931 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1948 | 21/05/1948 | 18 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64855 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/08/1949 | 10/09/1949 | 29 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/01/1952 | 01/03/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27558 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/12/1954 | 05/02/1955 | 51 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/11/1956 | 22/11/1956 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/06/1957 | 06/07/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27538 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/08/1957 | 17/08/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/04/1960 | 07/05/1960 | 34 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/10/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1475 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1597 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
26/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1936. Dep: 08/10/1936. | ||
24/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1939. Dep: 06/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1939. Dep: 20/04/1939. | ||
21/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1941. Dep: 22/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS122 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/10/1942. Dep: 11/11/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
10/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
01/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2714 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945. | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4855 | ||
01/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1946. Dep: 26/11/1946. | ||
29/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4931 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1948. Dep: 21/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64855 |
||
13/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/08/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949. | ||
29/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1952. Dep: 01/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27558 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/12/1954. Dep: 05/02/1955. | ||
08/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1956. Dep: 22/11/1956. | ||
07/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27538 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/08/1957. Dep: 17/08/1957. | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
04/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/04/1960. Dep: 07/05/1960. | ||
24/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
20/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64855 from Heaton (52B) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |