Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 141 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6530 Week
» 26972 Month
» 363818 Year
» 1585383 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1476 on 24/10/1934
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4856   26/10/1946
British Railways 64856   22/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 24/10/1934 to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Withdrawal Mon 15/10/1962 off Heaton (52B)
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Cowlairs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) on 24/10/1934
DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943
BLA Blaydon on 03/08/1943
HTN Heaton on 23/10/1949
   Withdrawn on 15/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 29/10/1949
WDN   w/e 15/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/10/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2579)
25/10/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2591)
13/07/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 7946)
14/04/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number BP141)
14/02/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1738)
19/04/1952 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27551)
17/05/1958 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27557)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 03/12/1936 15/01/1937 44 days General
Boiler number 27485 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 22/04/1939 25/05/1939 34 days General  
Darlington Works 15/09/1941 25/10/1941 41 days General
Boiler number 2591 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 10/06/1943 13/07/1943 34 days General
Boiler number 27487 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 24/03/1945 14/04/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 19/10/1946 26/10/1946 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4856
 
Cowlairs Works 04/12/1947 14/02/1948 73 days General
Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 25/03/1950 22/04/1950 29 days Heavy Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 64856
 
Cowlairs Works 21/02/1952 19/04/1952 59 days General
Boiler number 27551 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 01/09/1955 08/10/1955 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 09/04/1958 17/05/1958 39 days General
Boiler number 27557 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 08/12/1959 19/01/1960 43 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 09/12/1960 18/12/1960 10 days Unclassified
Not repaired
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/10/1934 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1476
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
03/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1936. Dep: 15/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27485 (Diagram 97)
   
22/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 25/05/1939.    
15/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1941. Dep: 25/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2591 (Diagram 97)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
10/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1943. Dep: 13/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27487 (Diagram 97)
   
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
24/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97)
   
19/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4856
   
04/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1947. Dep: 14/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97)
   
23/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
25/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/03/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64856
   
21/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27551 (Diagram 97)
   
01/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/09/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955.    
09/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27557 (Diagram 97)
   
08/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/12/1959. Dep: 19/01/1960.    
09/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/12/1960. Dep: 18/12/1960.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
   
15/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64856 from Heaton (52B)    

prev prev