|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 03/12/1936 | 15/01/1937 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27485 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1939 | 25/05/1939 | 34 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1941 | 25/10/1941 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2591 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1943 | 13/07/1943 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27487 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/03/1945 | 14/04/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/10/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4856 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/12/1947 | 14/02/1948 | 73 days | General | Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/03/1950 | 22/04/1950 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64856 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/02/1952 | 19/04/1952 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27551 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/09/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/04/1958 | 17/05/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27557 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1959 | 19/01/1960 | 43 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/12/1960 | 18/12/1960 | 10 days | Unclassified | Not repaired |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/10/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1476 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1598 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
03/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1936. Dep: 15/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27485 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 25/05/1939. | ||
15/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1941. Dep: 25/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2591 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
10/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1943. Dep: 13/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27487 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
24/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4856 |
||
04/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1947. Dep: 14/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
29/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
25/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/03/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64856 |
||
21/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27551 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/09/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955. | ||
09/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27557 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/12/1959. Dep: 19/01/1960. | ||
09/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/12/1960. Dep: 18/12/1960. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
15/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64856 from Heaton (52B) | ||
11/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |