|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/07/1936 | 17/08/1936 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1936 | 12/10/1936 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1938 | 03/08/1938 | 49 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1940 | 18/06/1940 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1943 | 27/02/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2573 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/03/1945 | 28/04/1945 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/11/1947 | 17/01/1948 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 4932 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/08/1950 | 01/09/1950 | 29 days | General | Renumbered to BR 64857 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/03/1953 | 08/06/1953 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 27454 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/11/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/09/1954 | 02/10/1954 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/11/1955 | 26/11/1955 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/09/1958 | 11/10/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27477 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/11/1958 | 08/12/1958 | 18 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/10/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1477 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1599 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
06/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1936. Dep: 17/08/1936. | ||
18/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1936. Dep: 12/10/1936. | ||
16/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1938. Dep: 03/08/1938. | ||
31/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
23/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
27/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
27/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1940. Dep: 18/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
29/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2573 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4857 | ||
09/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. | ||
06/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1947. Dep: 17/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4932 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1950. Dep: 01/09/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64857 |
||
24/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1953. Dep: 08/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27454 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/11/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953. | ||
03/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954. | ||
03/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 03/11/1955. Dep: 26/11/1955. | ||
09/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1958. Dep: 11/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27477 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1958. Dep: 08/12/1958. | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
22/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64857 from Neville Hill (55H) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |