Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1047 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7436 Week
» 27878 Month
» 364724 Year
» 1586289 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1478 on 14/11/1934
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4858   31/05/1946
British Railways 64858   25/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Thu 14/11/1934 to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Withdrawal Thu 29/03/1962 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 03/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) on 14/11/1934
DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943
BLA Blaydon on 29/08/1948
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 04/09/1949
BLA Blaydon on 02/10/1949
52G Sunderland on 15/01/1961
   Withdrawn on 29/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BLA Blaydon w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC BLA Blaydon w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 5w/e 04/02/1961
WDN   on 29/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
14/11/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2617)
22/04/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2591)
13/05/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2636)
08/03/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1713)
17/11/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27592)
27/10/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27580)
17/09/1960 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27711)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 21/08/1936 30/09/1936 41 days General  
Darlington Works 02/03/1939 22/04/1939 52 days General
Boiler number 2591 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 29/04/1940 27/05/1940 29 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 20/05/1941 21/06/1941 33 days General
Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 27/03/1942 23/05/1942 58 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 14/04/1944 13/05/1944 30 days General
Boiler number 2636 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 18/01/1947 08/03/1947 50 days General
Boiler number C1713 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 27/05/1949 25/06/1949 30 days Light Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 64858
 
Cowlairs Works 26/10/1951 17/11/1951 23 days General
Boiler number 27592 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 19/12/1953 30/01/1954 43 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 20/09/1956 27/10/1956 38 days General
Boiler number 27580 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 22/07/1960 17/09/1960 58 days General
Boiler number 27711 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 23/11/1961 02/12/1961 10 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/06/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/11/1934 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1478
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
21/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1936. Dep: 30/09/1936.    
02/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1939. Dep: 22/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2591 (Diagram 97)
   
29/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/04/1940. Dep: 27/05/1940.    
20/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1941. Dep: 21/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97)
   
27/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/03/1942. Dep: 23/05/1942.    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
14/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2636 (Diagram 97)
   
31/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4858    
18/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1713 (Diagram 97)
   
29/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
27/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/05/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64858
   
04/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
02/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
26/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27592 (Diagram 97)
   
19/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/12/1953. Dep: 30/01/1954.    
20/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27580 (Diagram 97)
   
22/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1960. Dep: 17/09/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27711 (Diagram 97)
   
15/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
23/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1961. Dep: 02/12/1961.    
29/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64858 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev