|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 23/09/1935 | 26/11/1935 | 65 days | Heavy | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1937 | 24/03/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1937 | 18/10/1937 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1939 | 25/10/1939 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2306 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1939 | 13/11/1939 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1942 | 18/06/1942 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 1919 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1942 | 08/01/1943 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1943 | 27/08/1943 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/07/1944 | 27/07/1944 | 27 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1945 | 07/07/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/07/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/10/1946 | 14/12/1946 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 2597 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4859 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/01/1949 | 05/03/1949 | 51 days | General | Renumbered to BR 64859 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/09/1951 | 05/10/1951 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1952 | 08/05/1952 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/02/1953 | 27/02/1953 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/05/1953 | 17/06/1953 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/10/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27478 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/06/1957 | 03/08/1957 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/09/1959 | 23/10/1959 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 25830 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/12/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1479 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1603 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
23/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/09/1935. Dep: 26/11/1935. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
23/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
24/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1937. Dep: 24/03/1937. | ||
13/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1937. Dep: 18/10/1937. | ||
18/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1939. Dep: 25/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2306 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1939. Dep: 13/11/1939. | ||
18/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1942. Dep: 18/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1919 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/12/1942. Dep: 08/01/1943. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
10/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
14/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/08/1943. Dep: 27/08/1943. | ||
01/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1944. Dep: 27/07/1944. | ||
23/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945. | ||
28/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/07/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. | ||
12/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2597 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4859 |
||
14/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1949. Dep: 05/03/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64859 |
||
06/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/09/1951. Dep: 05/10/1951. | ||
01/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/05/1952. Dep: 08/05/1952. | ||
06/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1953. Dep: 27/02/1953. | ||
28/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1953. Dep: 17/06/1953. | ||
16/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27478 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/06/1957. Dep: 03/08/1957. | ||
07/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1959. Dep: 23/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25830 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
24/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
15/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
18/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64859 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |