|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/03/1939 | 16/05/1939 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1941 | 29/11/1941 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27460 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/11/1943 | 08/12/1943 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2716 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/05/1946 | 03/08/1946 | 71 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/02/1949 | 07/05/1949 | 74 days | General | Renumbered to BR 64863 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/01/1952 | 23/02/1952 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/12/1954 | 15/01/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27553 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/01/1955 | 29/01/1955 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1958 | 22/10/1958 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/11/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1465 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1649 Allocated to Sunderland (SUN) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
15/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
28/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1939. Dep: 16/05/1939. | ||
28/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1941. Dep: 29/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27460 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
19/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1943. Dep: 08/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2716 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946. | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4863 | ||
04/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
10/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
28/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
23/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1949. Dep: 07/05/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64863 |
||
12/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
18/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
31/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/01/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952. | ||
17/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1954. Dep: 15/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27553 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/01/1955. Dep: 29/01/1955. | ||
19/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1958. Dep: 22/10/1958. | ||
31/01/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64863 from Neville Hill (55H) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |