Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1473 on 15/11/1935
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4864   27/10/1946
British Railways 64864   06/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service Mon 15/11/1935 to Sunderland (SUN)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Heaton (52B)
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 27 yrs , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SUN Sunderland (New) on 15/11/1935
CON Consett on 28/11/1938
TDK Tyne Dock on 14/11/1941
DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 04/01/1948
54C Borough Gardens on 03/12/1950
52C Blaydon on 04/01/1953
53A Hull Dairycoates on 13/06/1954
52B Heaton on 16/06/1957
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/01/1948
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/11/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2713)
03/06/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8005)
06/09/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1907)
15/04/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3174)
30/11/1946 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1834)
20/08/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3194)
05/06/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27679)
14/07/1961 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27525)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 02/05/1939 03/06/1939 33 days General
Boiler number 8005 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 29/07/1941 06/09/1941 40 days General
Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 06/03/1943 01/07/1943 118 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 08/03/1944 15/04/1944 39 days General
Boiler number 3174 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 05/10/1946 30/11/1946 57 days General
Boiler number 27532 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4864
 
Darlington Works 30/06/1948 06/08/1948 38 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 64864
 
Darlington Works 09/08/1948 27/08/1948 19 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 20/06/1949 20/08/1949 62 days General
Boiler number 27554 (Diagram 97)
 
Gateshead Works 11/10/1950 14/10/1950 4 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 16/10/1951 01/12/1951 47 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 02/08/1952 17/09/1952 47 days Heavy Casual  
Gateshead Works 16/10/1953 31/10/1953 16 days Light Casual  
Gateshead Works 22/12/1953 31/12/1953 10 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 14/04/1954 05/06/1954 53 days General
Boiler number 27679 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 13/12/1956 12/01/1957 31 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 23/05/1961 14/07/1961 53 days General
Boiler number 27525 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908
06/07/1961 Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/11/1935 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1473
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Sunderland (SUN)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
28/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (CON)    
14/11/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
04/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
03/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
04/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64864 from Heaton (52B)    

prev prev