Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 244 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2809 Week
» 1547 Month
» 415868 Year
» 1637433 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1485 on 26/11/1935
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4866   16/06/1946
British Railways 64866   11/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service Mon 26/11/1935 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Mon 24/09/1962 off Heaton (52B)
Scrapping During 10/1962
Service Life 26 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Cowlairs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) on 26/11/1935
SBK Starbeck on 14/07/1943
50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
52G Sunderland on 08/11/1959
52B Heaton on 13/12/1959
   Withdrawn on 24/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 24/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/11/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2715)
06/02/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number BP141)
19/09/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number BP138)
17/05/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2568)
07/02/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27742)
11/10/1958 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27522)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 07/02/1938 18/03/1938 40 days General  
Darlington Works 08/01/1940 06/02/1940 30 days General
Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 12/12/1940 1 day W  
Darlington Works 19/08/1942 19/09/1942 32 days General
Boiler number BP138 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 19/09/1944 07/10/1944 19 days General  
Cowlairs Works 12/01/1946 02/02/1946 22 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 15/03/1947 17/05/1947 64 days General
Boiler number 2568 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 10/02/1950 11/03/1950 30 days Heavy Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 64866
 
Cowlairs Works 26/04/1950 06/05/1950 11 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 16/11/1950 29/12/1950 44 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 14/11/1952 07/02/1953 86 days General
Boiler number 27742 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 18/08/1955 17/09/1955 31 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 09/09/1958 11/10/1958 33 days General
Boiler number 27522 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1945 Leeds Area Latest B.16/3 843 appeared on 2.5.p.m. Darlington-Leeds turn on 20/9. B.17 2826 was noted on 3/10 working north on a Class A Goods on the main line near Thirsk. N.13 2405 and J.21 1593 proceeded north through Ripon on 5/10 coupled together (1593 'dead') apparently going to works. The chief effect of the new timetables seems to have been a reduction in the loading of long distance passenger trains. The 9.20 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool E.P. during the first eleven days of the new timetable consisted of 14-16 bogies, compared with 15-18 previously. It has now been cut to 12 daily and the train is still double-headed from Ripon to Leeds. During the summer the relief to this train usually was made up of 12-14 bogies, and was always worked by one engine! Ex-N.E. Z have been much in evidence on Neville Hill turns lately. Since 4/10 the following combinations have been noted on the 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool: 2204 & 4866; 2193, 2206 an 722 all piloting 2568 on different days; 2208 & 3648; and 729 & 211 on the 9.0 Liverpool-Newcastle: On 12/10 the relief 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool was worked by K.2 4651 with 10 bogies, and piloted from Ripon by A.6 688 bunker first. D.21 1245 which was awaiting works at the Darlington shed visit in July, has reappeared, and was first noted on 8/10, piloting D.20 1210 on the 9.40 a.m. Leeds to Middlesbrough (a regular double-headed working). SLS/194601
13/09/1959 Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. SLS/195911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/11/1935 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1485
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
14/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK)    
16/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4866    
13/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
08/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
24/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64866 from Heaton (52B)    

prev prev