|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/02/1938 | 14/04/1938 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1940 | 21/10/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2717 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/01/1943 | 28/01/1943 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/06/1945 | 11/07/1945 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27487 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/12/1947 | 07/02/1948 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 2935 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/09/1949 | 22/10/1949 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64870 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/06/1951 | 14/07/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 27587 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/04/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27483 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/08/1956 | 22/09/1956 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/03/1958 | 03/05/1958 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/12/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1506 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1656 Allocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
28/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1938. Dep: 14/04/1938. | ||
09/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1940. Dep: 21/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2717 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1943. Dep: 28/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
09/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 11/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27487 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4870 | ||
04/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1947. Dep: 07/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2935 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
21/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64870 |
||
24/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
20/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1951. Dep: 14/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27587 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
19/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27483 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
30/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956. | ||
20/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/03/1958. Dep: 03/05/1958. | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
18/01/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64870 from Thornaby (51L) | ||
06/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |