|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1938 | 15/10/1938 | 56 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1939 | 17/02/1940 | 66 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1941 | 03/01/1942 | 40 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 22/12/1942 | 09/01/1943 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 06/02/1944 | 01/04/1944 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 2695 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/06/1946 | 14/11/1946 | 145 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 27/11/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 25 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4872 |
||
Stratford Works | 20/08/1948 | 26/09/1948 | 38 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64872 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1949 | 07/05/1949 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 2767 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1949 | 23/05/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1949 | 10/09/1949 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1949 | 12/10/1949 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1949 | 19/10/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 26/07/1951 | 10/09/1951 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1954 | 08/04/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1957 | 23/02/1957 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27877 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1958 | 20/12/1958 | 39 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1960 | 11/02/1961 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 27565 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/06/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2941 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1617 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
09/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
13/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
25/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
21/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938. | ||
14/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1939. Dep: 17/02/1940. | ||
25/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1941. Dep: 03/01/1942. | ||
22/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943. | ||
06/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1944. Dep: 01/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2695 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1946. Dep: 14/11/1946. | ||
27/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4872 |
||
20/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/08/1948. Dep: 26/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64872 |
||
01/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1949. Dep: 07/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2767 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1949. Dep: 23/05/1949. | ||
31/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949. | ||
05/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1949. Dep: 12/10/1949. | ||
16/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1949. Dep: 19/10/1949. | ||
16/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
30/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
26/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/07/1951. Dep: 10/09/1951. | ||
25/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1954. Dep: 08/04/1954. | ||
15/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1957. Dep: 23/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27877 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) | ||
12/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
12/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 12/11/1958. Dep: 20/12/1958. | ||
13/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1960. Dep: 11/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27565 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64872 from Low Moor (56F) | ||
08/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |