|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/05/1938 | 21/05/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 2678 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1941 | 02/04/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 2695 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/12/1943 | 22/12/1943 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/01/1946 | 01/02/1946 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/05/1947 | 20/06/1947 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/10/1950 | 21/11/1950 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27576 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/04/1953 | 24/04/1953 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/03/1955 | 16/03/1955 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/04/1956 | 26/05/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27500 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/08/1958 | 30/08/1958 | 23 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Inverurie Works | 21/03/1961 | 12/05/1961 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27574 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/06/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2944 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1620 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
13/09/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
07/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 21/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2678 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1941. Dep: 02/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2695 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1943. Dep: 22/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1946. Dep: 01/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4875 | ||
20/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
16/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1947. Dep: 20/06/1947. | ||
19/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64875 | ||
23/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1950. Dep: 21/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27576 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/04/1953. Dep: 24/04/1953. | ||
07/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1955. Dep: 16/03/1955. | ||
27/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1956. Dep: 26/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27500 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/08/1958. Dep: 30/08/1958. | ||
08/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
21/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1961. Dep: 12/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27574 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64875 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |