Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 327 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 327 Week
» 30617 Month
» 333807 Year
» 1555372 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2952 on 07/08/1935
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4883   08/12/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E4883   16/02/1948
British Railways 64883   30/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Fri 07/08/1935 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Fri 11/03/1960 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 24 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) on 07/08/1935
MAR March on 12/03/1938
GRA Grantham on 29/04/1942
NWE New England on 21/07/1944
LIN Lincoln on 01/07/1945
35C Spital Bridge on 12/10/1952
33A Plaistow on 07/04/1957
36A Doncaster on 26/05/1957
   Withdrawn on 11/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 15/06/1957
WDN   on 11/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/08/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2683)
14/12/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2318)
09/10/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2114)
01/12/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8772)
16/02/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2766)
27/10/1950 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2299)
06/05/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27776)
22/09/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27665)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/04/1937 21/05/1937 49 days General  
Gorton Works 04/03/1938 21/05/1938 79 days General  
Gorton Works 13/10/1940 14/12/1940 63 days General
Boiler number 2318 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 10/08/1943 09/10/1943 61 days General
Boiler number 2114 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1945 01/12/1945 63 days General
Boiler number 8772 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1947 16/02/1948 65 days General
Boiler number 2766 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4883
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1949 30/07/1949 46 days Light Casual
Renumbered to BR 64883
 
Derby Works 23/08/1950 27/10/1950 66 days General
Boiler number 2299 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 23/03/1953 06/05/1953 45 days General
Boiler number 27776 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1956 22/09/1956 76 days General
Boiler number 27665 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1950 Derby Works For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E.
New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station.
Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted).
SLS/195012
21/10/1950 Derby Works For Works: W/E 21/10/50, 40405 5C, 40505 71H, 40522 8E, 40743 20A, 41123 7A, 42184 16A, 42332 9B, 42374 33A, 42521 33D, 43212 18C, 44166 17B, 4267 22A, 44524 21A, 7096 1A, 7441 15C, 47469 23C, 20155 16A, 23006 3E, 58247 17C, (W) 2107 84F, 64834 32B, 64958 30A. The most interesting items are 40743 for intermediate repair, and 20155 (the last 2-4-0-Midland-for special examination which usually means condemnation).
New construction: 42054 on trials 18/10, 42055/6 completed, 42057-60 in various stages; 12078 in paint shop 18/10, 12079-81 complete, 12082-4 in various stages.
Ex works 40532/655, 41004/67, 42509/22, 42325, 47410, 64721/37/57, 64956/80 (W/E 18/10), 40584, 41001/60, 41153/65/81, 41833, 42345, 43586, 43992, 47340, 47674, 64883 (W/E 25/10).
Cut up: 15-18/10/50. Nos. 1251 an 1406 (old Nos.). No. 58236, in paint shop 18/10 with R/T boiler.
Stored: 407, 40418/513/556/632, 43342/64, 3368, 43482, 43200. (25/10).
SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/08/1935 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2952
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
03/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1937. Dep: 21/05/1937.    
04/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1938. Dep: 21/05/1938.    
12/03/1938 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
13/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2318 (Diagram 97)
   
29/04/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
10/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2114 (Diagram 97)
   
21/07/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
01/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
30/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8772 (Diagram 97)
   
08/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4883    
14/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1947. Dep: 16/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2766 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4883
   
15/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/06/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64883
   
23/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1950. Dep: 27/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2299 (Diagram 97)
   
12/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
23/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1953. Dep: 06/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27776 (Diagram 97)
   
09/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27665 (Diagram 97)
   
07/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
26/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
11/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64883 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev