|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/04/1937 | 12/06/1937 | 63 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1940 | 04/01/1941 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 2121 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1943 | 16/10/1943 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 2132 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1943 | 18/11/1943 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 03/03/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 4903 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1947 | 12/09/1947 | 125 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1948 | 20/11/1948 | 37 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64885 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1949 | 17/09/1949 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1949 | 30/09/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 18/08/1952 | 06/10/1952 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27724 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/01/1955 | 12/02/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1957 | 28/09/1957 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27823 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1957 | 08/10/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/08/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2981 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1630 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
11/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937. | ||
22/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
24/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
07/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2121 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2132 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1943. Dep: 18/11/1943. | ||
30/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4903 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4885 | ||
11/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1947. Dep: 12/09/1947. | ||
15/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1948. Dep: 20/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64885 |
||
08/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1949. Dep: 17/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1949. Dep: 30/09/1949. | ||
18/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1952. Dep: 06/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27724 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27823 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1957. Dep: 08/10/1957. | ||
17/02/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64885 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
03/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |