Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 348 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3896 Week
» 4786 Month
» 312767 Year
» 1197148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2987   18/09/1935
LNER (1946) 4891   29/12/1946
BR 64891   25/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 18/09/1935 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Mon 08/02/1960 off March (31B)
Scrapping Sun 28/02/1960
Service Life 24 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 18/09/1935
MAR March 21/10/1935
NWE New England 14/05/1938
BOS Boston 17/05/1938
CLK Colwick 03/08/1939
GRA Grantham 14/07/1940
CLK Colwick 23/10/1940
DON Doncaster 23/08/1946
38A Colwick 27/04/1952
35C Spital Bridge 12/04/1953
33A Plaistow 07/04/1957
32B Ipswich 26/05/1957
31B March 25/10/1959
   Withdrawn 08/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   08/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/09/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2695)
19/03/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2688)
13/02/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2182)
15/09/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8025)
25/06/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4939)
07/09/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27674)
11/12/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27658)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/02/1938 19/03/1938 20 days General
Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1940 05/10/1940 52 days General
Boiler number 2669 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1942 13/02/1943 70 days General
Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 04/04/1944 20/04/1944 17 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 08/07/1945 15/09/1945 70 days General
Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1948 25/06/1948 57 days General
Boiler number 4939 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64891
 
Derby Works 26/07/1951 07/09/1951 44 days General
Boiler number 27674 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 29/10/1954 11/12/1954 44 days General
Boiler number 27658 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/09/1935 To Service To service as LNER Number 2987
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
21/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
28/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97)
   
14/05/1938 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
17/05/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
03/08/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
14/07/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
15/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1940. Dep: 05/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2669 (Diagram 97)
   
23/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
06/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97)
   
04/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1944. Dep: 20/04/1944.    
08/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97)
   
23/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4891    
30/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1948. Dep: 25/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4939 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64891
   
26/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1951. Dep: 07/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27674 (Diagram 97)
   
27/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
12/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
29/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27658 (Diagram 97)
   
07/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
26/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
25/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
08/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64891 from March (31B)    

prev prev