|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/11/1937 | 04/12/1937 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2689 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1940 | 04/05/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8018 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 30/11/1942 | 19/12/1942 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2779 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/08/1943 | 28/08/1943 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1945 | 15/05/1945 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 2776 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 07/12/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4892 |
||
Stratford Works | 03/05/1947 | 17/05/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1948 | 28/02/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2720 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4892 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/04/1948 | 24/04/1948 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64892 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/03/1951 | 10/04/1951 | 28 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/07/1953 | 10/08/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27509 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/12/1954 | 08/01/1955 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1955 | 15/01/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/05/1957 | 06/07/1957 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27560 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Gorton Works | It appears that Gorton is repairing 'J.39's' in place of Cowlairs: No. E 4892 of Carlisle being seen in the shed ex Gorton 2/48. | SLS/194805 |
06/07/1961 | Cowlairs Works (Scrap Road) | Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/09/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2988 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1639 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
12/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
02/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1937. Dep: 04/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2689 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8018 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2779 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
21/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943. | ||
28/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1945. Dep: 15/05/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2776 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
07/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4892 |
||
03/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 17/05/1947. | ||
10/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
29/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1948. Dep: 28/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2720 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4892 |
||
17/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/04/1948. Dep: 24/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64892 |
||
14/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/03/1951. Dep: 10/04/1951. | ||
06/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1953. Dep: 10/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27509 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/12/1954. Dep: 08/01/1955. | ||
11/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1955. Dep: 15/01/1955. | ||
27/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27560 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/05/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64892 from Carlisle Canal (12C) | ||
06/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |