|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 31/07/1938 | 30/09/1938 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 2699 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1941 | 01/08/1941 | 85 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/01/1944 | 18/03/1944 | 50 days | General | Boiler number BP145 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1945 | 23/03/1946 | 103 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1947 | 10/10/1947 | 211 days | General | Boiler number 4926 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1948 | 16/04/1948 | 60 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64893 |
||
Derby Works | 02/11/1950 | 22/12/1950 | 51 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 29/04/1953 | 06/06/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27780 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1956 | 13/10/1956 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27762 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1956 | 27/10/1956 | 13 days | Unclassified | Not repaired |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1950 | Derby Works | In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed. Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal. |
SLS/195101 |
13/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. | SLS/195102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/10/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2989 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1640 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
11/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
28/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
31/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1938. Dep: 30/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2699 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
09/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1941. Dep: 01/08/1941. | ||
05/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
17/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
29/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP145 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/12/1945. Dep: 23/03/1946. | ||
20/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4893 | ||
14/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1947. Dep: 10/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4926 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/02/1948. Dep: 16/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64893 |
||
02/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/11/1950. Dep: 22/12/1950. | ||
04/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
29/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1953. Dep: 06/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27780 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1956. Dep: 13/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27762 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
07/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
11/07/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64893 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |