|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/07/1938 | 20/08/1938 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2701 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1941 | 05/04/1941 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2691 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/02/1944 | 19/04/1944 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3169 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 41 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1945 | 13/09/1945 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1946 | 07/09/1946 | 129 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/03/1949 | 09/05/1949 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27700 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64896 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1949 | 09/06/1949 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 04/02/1952 | 13/03/1952 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 19/03/1952 | 27/03/1952 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 10/04/1952 | 07/05/1952 | 28 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 09/04/1953 | 02/05/1953 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 17/09/1954 | 06/10/1954 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 01/07/1955 | 25/08/1955 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 27790 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/10/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2992 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1643 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
04/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
18/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2701 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
03/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
08/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
23/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1941. Dep: 05/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2691 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
28/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1944. Dep: 19/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3169 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/07/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. | ||
05/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1945. Dep: 13/09/1945. | ||
02/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. | ||
21/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4896 | ||
27/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1949. Dep: 09/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27700 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64896 |
||
01/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1949. Dep: 09/06/1949. | ||
04/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/02/1952. Dep: 13/03/1952. | ||
19/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1952. Dep: 27/03/1952. | ||
10/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/04/1952. Dep: 07/05/1952. | ||
28/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
09/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1953. Dep: 02/05/1953. | ||
17/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/09/1954. Dep: 06/10/1954. | ||
01/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1955. Dep: 25/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27790 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) | ||
26/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
09/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
07/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
27/08/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64896 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
10/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |