|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1938 | 21/12/1938 | 47 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1941 | 23/04/1941 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1942 | 02/05/1942 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1944 | 27/05/1944 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 2284 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 143 days | General | Boiler number 4918 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4901 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1947 | 23/01/1948 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 2681 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4901 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1950 | 18/01/1950 | 10 days | General | Boiler number E1351 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1951 | 30/06/1951 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 07/06/1953 | 08/08/1953 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 27789 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1956 | 20/10/1956 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27872 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 29/07/1959 | 31/07/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/02/1960 | Peterborough Midland Closure | Peterborough Midland (31F) closed as from 1st February and the engines were transferred as follows-to March D2239, 11156/7, 41949, 44152/273, 44509/21, 47300, 61095/6, 61156/204/5/323/48, 62613, 64789, 64901, 90063/447/501/28. To New England (34E) 43127; Grimesthorpe (41B) 44097/518; remainder returned to LMR viz. 43957, 44110/239/47/476/519/22. | SLS/196003 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/08/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2997 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1674 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
25/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 21/12/1938. | ||
24/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1941. Dep: 23/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/04/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
01/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/04/1942. Dep: 02/05/1942. | ||
02/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2284 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4918 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4901 |
||
10/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1947. Dep: 23/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2681 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4901 |
||
29/01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64901 | ||
09/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1950. Dep: 18/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1351 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (9G) | ||
07/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (9G) | ||
14/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1951. Dep: 30/06/1951. | ||
12/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
07/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27789 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1956. Dep: 20/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27872 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) | ||
26/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
29/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1959. Dep: 31/07/1959. | ||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
10/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
13/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64901 from March (31B) |