|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 30/10/1937 | 04/11/1937 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1938 | 19/10/1938 | 53 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1939 | 21/10/1939 | 67 days | Heavy | Boiler number BP140 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 26/04/1942 | 23/07/1942 | 89 days | General | Boiler number 8774 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/01/1943 | 05/02/1943 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 08/11/1944 | 16/12/1944 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1945 | 20/07/1945 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 8588 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1948 | 18/06/1948 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 4938 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64905 |
||
Derby Works | 03/01/1951 | 21/02/1951 | 50 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 28/02/1951 | 10/03/1951 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 19/06/1953 | 22/08/1953 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 27874 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/08/1956 | 05/10/1956 | 46 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27657 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1951 | Derby Works | During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned. At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic. |
SLS/195104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/09/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1803 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6802 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
02/10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
30/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1937. Dep: 04/11/1937. | ||
28/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1938. Dep: 19/10/1938. | ||
16/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/08/1939. Dep: 21/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP140 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
26/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1942. Dep: 23/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8774 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1943. Dep: 05/02/1943. | ||
08/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944. | ||
06/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1945. Dep: 20/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8588 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4905 | ||
19/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1948. Dep: 18/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4938 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64905 |
||
03/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/01/1951. Dep: 21/02/1951. | ||
28/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 10/03/1951. | ||
19/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27874 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1956. Dep: 05/10/1956. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27657 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64905 from Ipswich (32B) | ||
10/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |