|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 10/11/1937 | 18/11/1937 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1938 | 21/01/1939 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1940 | 28/12/1940 | 63 days | General | Boiler number E1356 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1943 | 18/12/1943 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1947 | 08/08/1947 | 139 days | General | Boiler number 4919 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1949 | 12/03/1949 | 55 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 64906 |
||
Derby Works | 19/06/1950 | 21/09/1950 | 95 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 19/03/1952 | 09/05/1952 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27696 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 05/10/1953 | 14/11/1953 | 41 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 03/04/1955 | 21/05/1955 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1958 | 08/04/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27831 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1958 | 16/04/1958 | 6 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/07/1950 | Derby Works | Engines into works: 40410, 413, 40929, 41088, 41752, 41902, 3574. 3579, 44127, 44242, 44262, 44277, 44575, 47301, 47426, 47513, 12011, 58229, 64752, 64906. | SLS/195008 |
15/09/1950 | Derby Works | For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E. New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station. Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted). |
SLS/195012 |
23/09/1950 | Derby Works | For Works: W/E 23/9/50:-40497 35C, 40532 35C, 41153 6A, 42381 9A, 43259 17A, 3321 21A, 43789 20C, 44235 71G, 44565 17D, 46404 15B, 7509 25E, 22975 (58154) 20E, 58091 15D (W)2060 82C. Ex Works: 2108, 40527, 41118, 43854, 43929/59/68, 44010, 44402, 47451, 47588, 64906/69. Withdrawn engines: Nos. 1251, 1406, 3511, 40515, 40498, 41017, 43818, 22853 an 58236 were still in the yard on 29/9, but since that date several have been fitted with tenders for supplying steam at carriage sidings, including 3511, 40515, 41017, 43297 and possibly 43818. The other four still in the yard have been joined by 58059 (9/10). |
SLS/195012 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1813 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6803 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
10/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1937. Dep: 18/11/1937. | ||
19/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1938. Dep: 21/01/1939. | ||
27/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1356 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/05/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
20/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4906 | ||
28/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
23/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1947. Dep: 08/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4919 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/01/1949. Dep: 12/03/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64906 |
||
19/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/06/1950. Dep: 21/09/1950. | ||
19/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1952. Dep: 09/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27696 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953. | ||
03/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1958. Dep: 08/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27831 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1958. Dep: 16/04/1958. | ||
12/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64906 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
05/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |