Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 625 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3311 Week
» 4201 Month
» 312182 Year
» 1196563 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1828   23/09/1936
LNER (1946) 4908   24/03/1946
BR 64908   07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 1529
Works Number 6805
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 23/09/1936 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Wed 22/03/1961 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 04/1961
Service Life 24 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) 23/09/1936
CLK Colwick 23/10/1936
DON Doncaster 23/08/1946
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/10/1947
   Withdrawn 22/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/10/1947
WDN   22/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/09/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1353)
17/08/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4908)
13/02/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3168)
21/07/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1350)
07/08/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4940)
26/06/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27888)
23/03/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 25838)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/08/1937 03/09/1937 12 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 18/09/1938 22/10/1938 35 days General  
Gorton Works 11/07/1940 17/08/1940 38 days General
Boiler number 4908 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1942 13/02/1943 64 days General
Boiler number 3168 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1943 17/03/1943 13 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/04/1945 21/07/1945 97 days General
Boiler number E1350 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1945 18/08/1945 10 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/04/1946 10/08/1946 119 days General  
Gorton Works 10/06/1948 07/08/1948 59 days General
Boiler number 4940 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64908
 
Derby Works 03/08/1951 15/09/1951 44 days Heavy Intermediate  
Stratford Works 26/05/1954 26/06/1954 32 days General
Boiler number 27888 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1957 23/03/1957 42 days General
Boiler number 25838 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/09/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 1828
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6805
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
23/10/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1937. Dep: 03/09/1937.    
18/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938.    
11/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4908 (Diagram 97)
   
12/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3168 (Diagram 97)
   
05/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1943. Dep: 17/03/1943.    
16/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E1350 (Diagram 97)
   
09/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1945. Dep: 18/08/1945.    
20/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4908    
14/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1946. Dep: 10/08/1946.    
23/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
10/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1948. Dep: 07/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4940 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64908
   
03/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/08/1951. Dep: 15/09/1951.    
26/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27888 (Diagram 97)
   
10/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1957. Dep: 23/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 25838 (Diagram 97)
   
22/03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64908 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev