|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/09/1937 | 15/09/1937 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1938 | 05/09/1938 | 35 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1939 | 16/01/1940 | 51 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1940 | 18/01/1941 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2720 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1941 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1943 | 19/06/1943 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2129 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/08/1944 | 09/09/1944 | 24 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/07/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/06/1948 | 17/07/1948 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2723 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64914 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/01/1951 | 10/02/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27562 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/02/1951 | 24/02/1951 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/08/1953 | 25/09/1953 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/01/1956 | 31/03/1956 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 27661 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/10/1958 | 15/11/1958 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 27535 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/10/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1532 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6811 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
08/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
06/02/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
13/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1937. Dep: 15/09/1937. | ||
02/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1938. Dep: 05/09/1938. | ||
27/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1939. Dep: 16/01/1940. | ||
02/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1940. Dep: 18/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2720 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
14/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1943. Dep: 19/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2129 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
17/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1944. Dep: 09/09/1944. | ||
16/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4914 | ||
27/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. | ||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
28/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
03/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
18/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1948. Dep: 17/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2723 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64914 |
||
16/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1951. Dep: 10/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27562 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951. | ||
28/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/08/1953. Dep: 25/09/1953. | ||
31/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1956. Dep: 31/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27661 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1958. Dep: 15/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27535 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64914 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
11/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |