|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/12/1937 | 09/12/1937 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1939 | 09/05/1939 | 49 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1941 | 28/02/1941 | 36 days | General | Boiler number BP134 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/12/1943 | 30/12/1943 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 27547 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/11/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1946 | 30/01/1946 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/03/1948 | 23/04/1948 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64921 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/11/1950 | 06/12/1950 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/02/1952 | 22/02/1952 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/04/1953 | 04/07/1953 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 27566 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/06/1955 | 13/07/1955 | 23 days | L/1 | |||
Inverurie Works | 02/05/1960 | 07/07/1960 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1544 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6818 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
12/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
19/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
07/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1937. Dep: 09/12/1937. | ||
22/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1939. Dep: 09/05/1939. | ||
24/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1941. Dep: 28/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP134 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
26/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
08/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1943. Dep: 30/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27547 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. | ||
08/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1946. Dep: 30/01/1946. | ||
16/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4921 | ||
16/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64921 |
||
29/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
04/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
06/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/11/1950. Dep: 06/12/1950. | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
15/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1952. Dep: 22/02/1952. | ||
24/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1953. Dep: 04/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27566 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/06/1955 | Works Visit | |||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
02/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1960. Dep: 07/07/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/02/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
20/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
12/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64921 from Heaton (52B) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |