|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 24/03/1938 | 26/03/1938 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1939 | 15/07/1939 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 27526 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1942 | 09/04/1942 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27525 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/05/1944 | 03/06/1944 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1947 | 23/08/1947 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 4923 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/10/1949 | 03/12/1949 | 41 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64923 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/10/1952 | 26/10/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/08/1953 | 12/09/1953 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/12/1955 | 28/01/1956 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/06/1956 | 06/07/1956 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/10/1957 | 16/11/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27636 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. | SLS/194710 |
07/09/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. | SLS/194711 |
30/11/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. | SLS/195001 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/11/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1547 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6820 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
19/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
24/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/03/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938. | ||
27/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1939. Dep: 15/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27526 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1942. Dep: 09/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27525 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
27/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
03/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4923 | ||
24/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4923 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
24/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/10/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64923 |
||
03/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1952. Dep: 26/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1953. Dep: 12/09/1953. | ||
15/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/12/1955. Dep: 28/01/1956. | ||
26/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/06/1956. Dep: 06/07/1956. | ||
11/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27636 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64923 from Heaton (52B) | ||
11/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |