|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/04/1938 | 06/04/1938 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1939 | 30/12/1939 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2925 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1941 | 22/05/1941 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1943 | 11/02/1943 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2946 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/08/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2938 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/05/1948 | 19/06/1948 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2223 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64925 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1950 | 18/08/1950 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/08/1952 | 13/09/1952 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 27541 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/09/1952 | 22/09/1952 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/02/1955 | 17/02/1955 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/02/1956 | 10/03/1956 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1957 | 18/01/1957 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/02/1959 | 13/03/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27425 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Steaming Pits) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
30/06/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. | SLS/195008 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/04/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1577 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6822 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
03/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
04/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1938. Dep: 06/04/1938. | ||
27/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1939. Dep: 30/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2925 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1941. Dep: 22/05/1941. | ||
08/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1943. Dep: 11/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2946 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2938 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4925 | ||
09/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. | ||
21/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1948. Dep: 19/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2223 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64925 |
||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
14/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
07/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/07/1950. Dep: 18/08/1950. | ||
24/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1952. Dep: 13/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27541 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/09/1952. Dep: 22/09/1952. | ||
15/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1955. Dep: 17/02/1955. | ||
10/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/02/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956. | ||
11/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1957. Dep: 18/01/1957. | ||
13/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1959. Dep: 13/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27425 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64925 from Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |