Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 169 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 169 Week
» 39215 Month
» 413228 Year
» 1634793 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1585 on 16/04/1937
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4927   01/09/1946
British Railways 64927   26/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 1532
Works Number 6824
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service Mon 16/04/1937 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) on 16/04/1937
SUN Sunderland on 06/05/1937
TWD Tweedmouth on 08/07/1939
BLA Blaydon on 17/01/1940
DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943
BLA Blaydon on 16/07/1943
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 09/05/1948
54C Borough Gardens on 04/02/1951
51F West Auckland on 10/06/1956
56D Mirfield on 15/04/1962
56B Ardsley on 18/11/1962
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens w/e 04/02/1951
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 3w/e 24/11/1962
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/04/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number BP143)
27/01/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number BP131)
04/12/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2940)
07/11/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4928)
21/12/1952 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27518)
13/04/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27586)
08/11/1960 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27568)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 25/05/1938 27/05/1938 3 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 27/06/1939 22/07/1939 26 days General  
Darlington Works 27/12/1941 27/01/1942 32 days General
Boiler number BP131 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 30/01/1942 12/02/1942 14 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 19/10/1942 04/11/1942 17 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Cowlairs Works 15/11/1943 04/12/1943 20 days General
Boiler number 2940 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 13/10/1945 03/11/1945 22 days General  
Cowlairs Works 09/09/1947 07/11/1947 60 days General
Boiler number 4928 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 15/10/1949 26/11/1949 43 days Light Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 64927
 
Cowlairs Works 24/11/1952 21/12/1952 28 days General
Boiler number 27518 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 14/02/1957 13/04/1957 59 days General
Boiler number 27586 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 29/09/1960 08/11/1960 41 days General
Boiler number 27568 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/09/1947 Eastfield MPD Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. SLS/194711
31/10/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. SLS/194912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/04/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1585
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6824
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
06/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN)    
08/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)    
17/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
16/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4927    
09/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
10/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
15/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
18/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64927 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev