|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/05/1938 | 27/05/1938 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1939 | 22/07/1939 | 26 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1941 | 27/01/1942 | 32 days | General | Boiler number BP131 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1942 | 12/02/1942 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1942 | 04/11/1942 | 17 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/11/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2940 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/10/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 22 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/09/1947 | 07/11/1947 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 4928 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/10/1949 | 26/11/1949 | 43 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64927 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/11/1952 | 21/12/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 27518 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/02/1957 | 13/04/1957 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27586 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/09/1960 | 08/11/1960 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27568 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/09/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. | SLS/194711 |
31/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. | SLS/194912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/04/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1585 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6824 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
06/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
25/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/05/1938. Dep: 27/05/1938. | ||
27/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939. | ||
08/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
17/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
27/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1941. Dep: 27/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP131 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/01/1942. Dep: 12/02/1942. | ||
19/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1942. Dep: 04/11/1942. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
16/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
15/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2940 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4927 | ||
09/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1947. Dep: 07/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4928 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
15/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
15/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/10/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64927 |
||
04/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
24/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1952. Dep: 21/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27518 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
14/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27586 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1960. Dep: 08/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27568 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
18/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64927 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |