|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/09/1938 | 19/09/1938 | 13 days | Unclassified | Welded boiler exam |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1940 | 07/03/1940 | 28 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1942 | 13/04/1942 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2340 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/10/1944 | 18/11/1944 | 26 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/04/1947 | 26/06/1947 | 83 days | General | Boiler number BP142 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/12/1948 | 31/12/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64936 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/09/1950 | 14/10/1950 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/11/1952 | 21/02/1953 | 100 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 27537 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1954 | 16/10/1954 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/07/1959 | 13/08/1959 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 25900 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
20/07/1957 | Durham Miners\' Gala | Saturday, 20th July. Special trains were run from Waterhouses to Durham on which line passenger traffic does not normally run. Special trains were also run from Usworth Colliery and Washington to Durham and a greatly augmented service operated from Sunderland. 17 locomotives of types J39, K1 and ex-LMS class 4MT were borrowed by Sunderland shed from neighbouring sheds to operate the traffic. On the Waterhouses branch, J39 64936 and A8 69853 were observed. Newcastle-D20 62395 has been regularly working trains to Alnwick during July. J27 65781 (54A) has been observed repainted with the new emblem. | SLS/195709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/02/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1537 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1729 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
07/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/09/1938. Dep: 19/09/1938. Work undertaken: Welded boiler exam |
||
09/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1940. Dep: 07/03/1940. | ||
05/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1942. Dep: 13/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2340 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944. | ||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4936 | ||
05/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1947. Dep: 26/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP142 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
17/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/12/1948. Dep: 31/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64936 |
||
07/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/09/1950. Dep: 14/10/1950. | ||
14/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/11/1952. Dep: 21/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27537 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
02/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1959. Dep: 13/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25900 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64936 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |