Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 104 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4064 Week
» 33650 Month
» 407663 Year
» 1629228 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1542 on 02/03/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4939   16/06/1946
British Railways 64939   09/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service Wed 02/03/1938 to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Withdrawal Wed 18/04/1962 off Heaton (52B)
Scrapping During 03/1963
Service Life 24 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) on 02/03/1938
DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943
SBK Starbeck on 14/07/1943
DAR Darlington on 14/01/1946
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 04/01/1948
54C Borough Gardens on 03/12/1950
54A Sunderland on 01/02/1953
53A Hull Dairycoates on 10/06/1956
52B Heaton on 16/06/1957
   Withdrawn on 18/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/01/1948
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   on 18/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/03/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2925)
09/12/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2935)
27/11/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4904)
13/04/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27468)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 07/11/1939 09/12/1939 33 days General
Boiler number 2935 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 06/02/1940 12/04/1940 67 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 07/04/1941 12/05/1941 36 days Unclassified
Right hand side cylinder cracked
 
Darlington Works 28/10/1942 27/11/1942 31 days General
Boiler number 27544 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 15/07/1944 19/08/1944 36 days General  
Cowlairs Works 06/07/1946 24/08/1946 50 days General  
Cowlairs Works 18/01/1947 08/02/1947 22 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 14/01/1949 09/04/1949 86 days General
Renumbered to BR 64939
 
Cowlairs Works 21/10/1952 09/11/1952 20 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 24/04/1953 22/05/1953 29 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 24/06/1954 05/08/1954 43 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 07/09/1954 18/10/1954 42 days General
Boiler number 27547 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 07/03/1957 13/04/1957 38 days General
Boiler number 27468 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/03/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1542
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
07/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2935 (Diagram 97)
   
06/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1940. Dep: 12/04/1940.    
07/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1941. Dep: 12/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Right hand side cylinder cracked
   
28/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1942. Dep: 27/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27544 (Diagram 97)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
14/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK)    
15/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944.    
14/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
16/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4939    
06/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946.    
18/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 08/02/1947.    
04/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
14/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1949. Dep: 09/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64939
   
03/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
21/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 21/10/1952. Dep: 09/11/1952.    
01/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
24/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1953. Dep: 22/05/1953.    
24/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/06/1954. Dep: 05/08/1954.    
07/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1954. Dep: 18/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27547 (Diagram 97)
   
10/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
07/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27468 (Diagram 97)
   
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
18/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64939 from Heaton (52B)    

prev prev