|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 09/01/1940 | 10/02/1940 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1942 | 15/04/1942 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2100 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1943 | 08/02/1943 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1943 | 14/01/1944 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/11/1944 | 25/11/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2568 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/03/1947 | 18/06/1947 | 82 days | General | Boiler number 4921 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/01/1950 | 04/02/1950 | 30 days | General | Renumbered to BR 64940 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/02/1952 | 24/03/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27555 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/06/1954 | 17/07/1954 | 27 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/02/1958 | 05/04/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/06/1960 | 27/08/1960 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 27774 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/08/1960 | 01/09/1960 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. | SLS/195003 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/03/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1546 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1733 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
09/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1942. Dep: 15/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2100 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/01/1943. Dep: 08/02/1943. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
14/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1943. Dep: 14/01/1944. | ||
02/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2568 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4940 | ||
29/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 18/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4921 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
06/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1950. Dep: 04/02/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64940 |
||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
16/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1952. Dep: 24/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27555 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
21/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 21/06/1954. Dep: 17/07/1954. | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
26/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1958. Dep: 05/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1960. Dep: 27/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27774 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1960. Dep: 01/09/1960. | ||
17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64940 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |