|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 24/06/1940 | 27/07/1940 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2946 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1941 | 21/01/1942 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1942 | 15/01/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2935 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/09/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2099 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1945 | 24/03/1945 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/06/1947 | 11/10/1947 | 115 days | General | Boiler number 2936 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/05/1950 | 03/06/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 275 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64942 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/04/1953 | 26/04/1953 | 20 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/02/1956 | 14/04/1956 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27700 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/07/1959 | 22/08/1959 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/04/1960 | 04/05/1960 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/10/1961 | 04/10/1961 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
30/10/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. | SLS/194712 |
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/03/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1551 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1735 Allocated to Middlesbrough (MID) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
01/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
24/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2946 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1941. Dep: 21/01/1942. | ||
17/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1942. Dep: 15/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2935 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
21/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2099 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945. | ||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4942 | ||
19/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1947. Dep: 11/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2936 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
03/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1950. Dep: 03/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 275 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64942 |
||
07/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 26/04/1953. | ||
16/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1956. Dep: 14/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27700 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/07/1959. Dep: 22/08/1959. | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
20/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
12/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1960. Dep: 04/05/1960. | ||
03/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1961. Dep: 04/10/1961. | ||
14/01/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64942 from Heaton (52B) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |