|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 20/06/1939 | 19/09/1939 | 92 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1941 | 17/04/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27521 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1941 | 02/07/1941 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/07/1941 | 30/07/1941 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1941 | 26/08/1941 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1942 | 10/07/1942 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/03/1944 | 29/04/1944 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2685 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/07/1946 | 27/07/1946 | 22 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4943 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/09/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 36 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/07/1947 | 19/07/1947 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/02/1949 | 11/06/1949 | 125 days | General | Boiler number 27483 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64943 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/06/1952 | 30/06/1952 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/11/1954 | 29/12/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2699 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/09/1958 | 11/10/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27595 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1960 | 21/09/1960 | 2 days | W | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1961 | 02/03/1961 | 31 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/04/1954 | Wetherby Races, Easter Monday | Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. | SLS/195406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/04/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1558 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1736 Allocated to Middlesbrough (MID) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
20/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/06/1939. Dep: 19/09/1939. | ||
17/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1941. Dep: 17/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27521 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1941. Dep: 02/07/1941. | ||
17/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/07/1941. Dep: 30/07/1941. | ||
15/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/08/1941. Dep: 26/08/1941. | ||
04/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1942. Dep: 10/07/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
21/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2685 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4943 |
||
07/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. | ||
10/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
01/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
03/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/07/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947. | ||
07/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1949. Dep: 11/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27483 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64943 |
||
29/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
04/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
07/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/06/1952. Dep: 30/06/1952. | ||
26/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1954. Dep: 29/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2699 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1958. Dep: 11/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27595 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
20/09/1960 | Works Visit | |||
31/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1961. Dep: 02/03/1961. | ||
17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64943 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |