|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 03/01/1940 | 20/01/1940 | 18 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/05/1940 | 04/05/1940 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/08/1941 | 30/08/1941 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/02/1942 | 28/02/1942 | 26 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/11/1942 | 11/11/1942 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/09/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 27526 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/06/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 57 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4945 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/11/1947 | 24/01/1948 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 2100 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/08/1949 | 03/09/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number C2018 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64945 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1949 | 28/11/1949 | 67 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/08/1953 | 22/09/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27461 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/10/1953 | 16/10/1953 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/10/1956 | 15/11/1956 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1957 | 16/02/1957 | 37 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/09/1959 | 17/10/1959 | 26 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 25831 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/03/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1804 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1740 Allocated to St Margarets (STM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
03/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1940. Dep: 20/01/1940. | ||
01/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/05/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. | ||
11/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941. | ||
03/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1942. Dep: 28/02/1942. | ||
28/09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
10/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1942. Dep: 11/11/1942. | ||
18/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (PKD) | ||
17/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
18/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
30/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27526 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/06/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4945 |
||
12/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
29/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
25/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1947. Dep: 24/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2100 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
20/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
01/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1949. Dep: 03/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number C2018 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64945 |
||
23/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1949. Dep: 28/11/1949. | ||
28/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1953. Dep: 22/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27461 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1953. Dep: 16/10/1953. | ||
16/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/10/1956. Dep: 15/11/1956. | ||
11/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1957. Dep: 16/02/1957. | ||
22/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1959. Dep: 17/10/1959. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 25831 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64945 from Heaton (52B) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |